Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2037 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 12, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 18, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 13, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 4, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 3, 2021