Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB204 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-S.B. No. 204
1+By: Schwertner, et al. S.B. No. 204
2+ (Huberty)
23
34
5+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
46 AN ACT
57 relating to the operation of a public school transportation system.
68 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
7- SECTION 1. Section 34.007, Education Code, is amended by
8- amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (a-1) and (c) to
9+ SECTION 1. Section 34.007(a), Education Code, is amended to
910 read as follows:
1011 (a) A board of county school trustees or a school district
1112 board of trustees may establish and operate an economical public
1213 school transportation system:
13- (1) in the county or district, as applicable; [or]
14+ (1) in the county or district, as applicable; or
1415 (2) outside the county or district, as applicable, if
15- the county or school district enters into an interlocal contract as
16- provided by Chapter 791, Government Code; or
17- (3) outside the district if students enrolled in the
18- district reside outside the district and the district:
19- (A) has an active policy adopted by the board
20- that prohibits screening transfer students who reside outside the
21- district based on the student's academic performance, disciplinary
22- history, or attendance record, regardless of any relevant district
23- or innovation plan adopted by the board or authorization to screen
24- transfer students under any other authority; and
25- (B) certifies that the district has:
26- (i) an overall performance rating of C or
27- higher under Section 39.054 for the preceding school year or the
28- most recent school year in which a performance rating was assigned;
29- (ii) an overall accountability score of 70
30- or higher for the preceding school year or the most recent school
31- year in which a performance rating was assigned as calculated by the
32- agency for purposes of determining the district's overall
33- performance rating under Section 39.054; and
34- (iii) the same or better overall
35- performance rating under Section 39.054 for the preceding school
36- year or the most recent school year in which a performance rating
37- was assigned as the school district from which the district will
38- transport students under this subdivision.
39- (a-1) A school district shall make publicly available on the
40- district's Internet website information regarding the district's
41- compliance with the requirements under Subsection (a)(3).
42- (c) This section may not be construed to prohibit a board of
43- county school trustees or a school district board of trustees from
44- operating a transportation system in another county or district, as
45- applicable, to ensure the most efficient routes for transporting
46- students who reside in the operating county or district.
16+ students served by the county system or enrolled in the school
17+ district reside outside the county or district, as applicable [the
18+ county or school district enters into an interlocal contract as
19+ provided by Chapter 791, Government Code].
4720 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
4821 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
4922 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
5023 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
5124 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
52- ______________________________ ______________________________
53- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
54- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 204 passed the Senate on
55- April 12, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 26, Nays 5;
56- May 27, 2021, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
57- requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 28, 2021, House
58- granted request of the Senate; May 30, 2021, Senate adopted
59- Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 27,
60- Nays 4.
61- ______________________________
62- Secretary of the Senate
63- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 204 passed the House, with
64- amendments, on May 25, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 115,
65- Nays 28, one present not voting; May 28, 2021, House granted
66- request of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
67- May 30, 2021, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
68- following vote: Yeas 138, Nays 4, one present not voting.
69- ______________________________
70- Chief Clerk of the House
71- Approved:
72- ______________________________
73- Date
74- ______________________________
75- Governor