Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB204 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/31/2021

                            S.B. No. 204


 AN ACT
 relating to the operation of a public school transportation system.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 34.007, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (a-1) and (c) to
 read as follows:
 (a)  A board of county school trustees or a school district
 board of trustees may establish and operate an economical public
 school transportation system:
 (1)  in the county or district, as applicable; [or]
 (2)  outside the county or district, as applicable, if
 the county or school district enters into an interlocal contract as
 provided by Chapter 791, Government Code; or
 (3)  outside the district if students enrolled in the
 district reside outside the district and the district:
 (A)  has an active policy adopted by the board
 that prohibits screening transfer students who reside outside the
 district based on the student's academic performance, disciplinary
 history, or attendance record, regardless of any relevant district
 or innovation plan adopted by the board or authorization to screen
 transfer students under any other authority; and
 (B)  certifies that the district has:
 (i)  an overall performance rating of C or
 higher under Section 39.054 for the preceding school year or the
 most recent school year in which a performance rating was assigned;
 (ii)  an overall accountability score of 70
 or higher for the preceding school year or the most recent school
 year in which a performance rating was assigned as calculated by the
 agency for purposes of determining the district's overall
 performance rating under Section 39.054; and
 (iii)  the same or better overall
 performance rating under Section 39.054 for the preceding school
 year or the most recent school year in which a performance rating
 was assigned as the school district from which the district will
 transport students under this subdivision.
 (a-1)  A school district shall make publicly available on the
 district's Internet website information regarding the district's
 compliance with the requirements under Subsection (a)(3).
 (c)  This section may not be construed to prohibit a board of
 county school trustees or a school district board of trustees from
 operating a transportation system in another county or district, as
 applicable, to ensure the most efficient routes for transporting
 students who reside in the operating county or district.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 204 passed the Senate on
 April 12, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 26, Nays 5;
 May 27, 2021, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 28, 2021, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 30, 2021, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 27,
 Nays 4.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 204 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 25, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 115,
 Nays 28, one present not voting; May 28, 2021, House granted
 request of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 30, 2021, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 138, Nays 4, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor