LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2021 - 87th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB206
Draft Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB206
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2021 - 87th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB206
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
November 18, 2020
Compare
Comm Sub
Bill
April 22, 2021
Compare
Fiscal Note
Fiscal Note
April 22, 2021
Fiscal Note
March 23, 2021
Analysis
Analysis
April 21, 2021
Analysis
March 9, 2021