Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB206 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/22/2021

                            By: Schwertner S.B. No. 206
 (In the Senate - Filed November 17, 2020; March 3, 2021,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 22, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 22, 2021,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 206 By:  Hancock


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the operation of golf carts in certain areas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 551.403, Transportation Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 551.403.  OPERATION AUTHORIZED IN CERTAIN AREAS. (a)
 An operator may operate a golf cart:
 (1)  in a master planned community:
 (A)  that is a residential subdivision as defined
 by Section 209.002(9), Property Code, or has in place a uniform set
 of restrictive covenants; and
 (B)  for which a county or municipality has
 approved one or more plats [a plat];
 (2)  on a public or private beach that is open to
 vehicular traffic; or
 (3)  on a highway for which the posted speed limit is
 not more than 35 miles per hour, if the golf cart is operated:
 (A)  during the daytime; and
 (B)  not more than two miles from the location
 where the golf cart is usually parked and for transportation to or
 from a golf course.
 (b)  Notwithstanding Section 551.402(b), a person may
 operate a golf cart in a master planned community described by
 Subsection (a) without a golf cart license plate on a highway for
 which the posted speed limit is not more than 35 miles per hour,
 including through an intersection of a highway for which the posted
 speed limit is more than 35 miles per hour.
 SECTION 2.  Section 551.4031, Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 551.4031.  PROHIBITION OF OPERATION ON HIGHWAY BY
 MUNICIPALITY, COUNTY, OR DEPARTMENT. (a) A county or municipality
 may prohibit the operation of a golf cart on a highway under Section
 551.403 [551.404] if the governing body of the county or
 municipality determines that the prohibition is necessary in the
 interest of safety.
 (b)  The Texas Department of Transportation may prohibit the
 operation of a golf cart on a highway under Section 551.403
 [551.404] if the department determines that the prohibition is
 necessary in the interest of safety.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *