Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2073 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 87R11173 JG-D
22 By: Menéndez S.B. No. 2073
33
44
55 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
66 AN ACT
77 relating to the regulation of certain hazardous substances used in
88 firefighting products; providing civil penalties.
99 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1010 SECTION 1. Subtitle D, Title 6, Health and Safety Code, is
1111 amended by adding Chapter 501A to read as follows:
1212 CHAPTER 501A. REGULATION OF CERTAIN HAZARDOUS SUBSTANCES USED IN
1313 FIREFIGHTING PRODUCTS
1414 Sec. 501A.001. DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
1515 (1) "Department" means the Department of State Health
1616 Services.
1717 (2) "Perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl chemicals"
1818 means a class of fluorinated organic chemicals containing at least
1919 one fully fluorinated carbon atom.
2020 Sec. 501A.002. DISCHARGE OR USE OF CERTAIN FIREFIGHTING
2121 FOAMS PROHIBITED. A person may not discharge or otherwise use a
2222 firefighting foam designed to extinguish flammable liquid fires
2323 that contains intentionally added perfluoroalkyl and
2424 polyfluoroalkyl chemicals, including the discharge or use of a
2525 firefighting foam described by this section during or for the
2626 training of firefighters.
2727 Sec. 501A.003. MANUFACTURE, SALE, AND DISTRIBUTION OF
2828 CERTAIN FIREFIGHTING FOAMS PROHIBITED. Unless otherwise required
2929 by federal law, a manufacturer of firefighting foams may not
3030 manufacture, knowingly sell, offer for sale, distribute for sale,
3131 or distribute for use in this state a firefighting foam designed to
3232 extinguish flammable liquid fires that contains intentionally
3333 added perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl chemicals.
3434 Sec. 501A.0035. RECALL OF CERTAIN FIREFIGHTING FOAMS. (a)
3535 Not later than March 1, 2023, a manufacturer of a firefighting foam
3636 described by Section 501A.003 shall provide to each person who
3737 sells the firefighting foam in this state written notice of the
3838 prohibition described by that section.
3939 (b) Not later than March 1, 2024, a manufacturer of a
4040 firefighting foam described by Section 501A.003 shall recall the
4141 firefighting foam sold or distributed throughout this state and
4242 provide reimbursement to each retailer or other person subject to
4343 the recall. In recalling a firefighting foam under this subsection,
4444 the manufacturer shall:
4545 (1) ensure the safe transport and storage of the
4646 firefighting foam; and
4747 (2) maintain documentation on the locations at which
4848 the manufacturer stores recalled firefighting foam and the total
4949 amount stored at each location.
5050 (c) A manufacturer shall store recalled firefighting foam
5151 in accordance with Subsection (b)(1), at the cost of the
5252 manufacturer, for the time as necessary for the department to
5353 determine a safe method for disposal of the firefighting foam.
5454 (d) On request of the attorney general or a district
5555 attorney, a manufacturer shall provide to the attorney general or
5656 district attorney the documentation maintained by the manufacturer
5757 under Subsection (b)(2).
5858 (e) This section expires September 1, 2027.
5959 Sec. 501A.004. NOTICE REQUIREMENTS FOR SALE OF CERTAIN
6060 PERSONAL PROTECTIVE EQUIPMENT. (a) A manufacturer or other person
6161 who sells to a person in this state firefighting personal
6262 protective equipment that contains perfluoroalkyl and
6363 polyfluoroalkyl chemicals shall provide to the person, at the time
6464 of the sale, written notice that:
6565 (1) includes a statement warning the equipment
6666 contains perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl chemicals; and
6767 (2) lists the reasons the perfluoroalkyl and
6868 polyfluoroalkyl chemicals were added to the equipment.
6969 (b) A manufacturer or other person who sells firefighting
7070 personal protective equipment that contains perfluoroalkyl and
7171 polyfluoroalkyl chemicals shall maintain copies of each written
7272 notice provided by the manufacturer or person under Subsection (a)
7373 until at least the third anniversary of the date the equipment was
7474 sold. The manufacturer or other person shall provide to the
7575 department on request not later than the 60th day after the date the
7676 request is received a copy of the written notice and any associated
7777 sales records.
7878 Sec. 501A.005. VERIFICATION OF COMPLIANCE. Not later than
7979 the 30th day after the date a manufacturer of firefighting foams or
8080 firefighting personal protective equipment receives a request from
8181 the department, the manufacturer shall prepare and submit to the
8282 department, in the form and manner prescribed by the department, a
8383 written verification of the manufacturer's compliance with this
8484 chapter.
8585 Sec. 501A.006. ASSISTANCE IN PURCHASE OF FIREFIGHTING
8686 PRODUCTS. The department shall develop and implement a process to
8787 provide purchasing assistance to governmental entities to ensure
8888 the entities:
8989 (1) avoid purchasing firefighting foam designed to
9090 extinguish flammable liquid fires that contains intentionally
9191 added perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl chemicals; and
9292 (2) are encouraged to purchase firefighting personal
9393 protective equipment that does not contain perfluoroalkyl and
9494 polyfluoroalkyl chemicals.
9595 Sec. 501A.007. CIVIL PENALTY. (a) A manufacturer or other
9696 person who violates this chapter is subject to a civil penalty in an
9797 amount of:
9898 (1) for a first violation, $5,000; and
9999 (2) for a second and each subsequent violation,
100100 $10,000.
101101 (b) Each day a violation occurs or continues to occur is a
102102 separate violation for purposes of assessing a penalty under this
103103 section.
104104 (c) On request of the department, the attorney general may
105105 bring an action in a district court to collect a civil penalty under
106106 this section. The attorney general and the department may recover
107107 reasonable expenses incurred in obtaining relief under this
108108 section, including court costs, attorney's fees, investigation
109109 costs, witness fees, and deposition expenses.
110110 (d) A civil penalty collected under this section shall be
111111 deposited to the credit of the clean air account in the general
112112 revenue fund.
113113 SECTION 2. (a) Notwithstanding 501A.002, Health and Safety
114114 Code, as added by this Act, a person who uses a firefighting foam
115115 designed to extinguish flammable liquid fires that contains
116116 intentionally added perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl chemicals
117117 during or for the training of firefighters is not required to comply
118118 with that section until January 1, 2022.
119119 (b) Notwithstanding Section 501A.003, Health and Safety
120120 Code, as added by this Act, a manufacturer of a firefighting foam
121121 designed to extinguish flammable liquid fires that contains
122122 intentionally added perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl chemicals
123123 is not required to comply with that section until January 1, 2022.
124124 (c) Notwithstanding Section 501A.004, Health and Safety
125125 Code, as added by this Act, a manufacturer or other person who sells
126126 firefighting personal protective equipment is not required to
127127 comply with that section until January 1, 2022.
128128 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.