Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2073 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/12/2021

                            87R11173 JG-D
 By: Menéndez S.B. No. 2073


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the regulation of certain hazardous substances used in
 firefighting products; providing civil penalties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle D, Title 6, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 501A to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 501A. REGULATION OF CERTAIN HAZARDOUS SUBSTANCES USED IN
 FIREFIGHTING PRODUCTS
 Sec. 501A.001.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Department" means the Department of State Health
 Services.
 (2)  "Perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl chemicals"
 means a class of fluorinated organic chemicals containing at least
 one fully fluorinated carbon atom.
 Sec. 501A.002.  DISCHARGE OR USE OF CERTAIN FIREFIGHTING
 FOAMS PROHIBITED. A person may not discharge or otherwise use a
 firefighting foam designed to extinguish flammable liquid fires
 that contains intentionally added perfluoroalkyl and
 polyfluoroalkyl chemicals, including the discharge or use of a
 firefighting foam described by this section during or for the
 training of firefighters.
 Sec. 501A.003.  MANUFACTURE, SALE, AND DISTRIBUTION OF
 CERTAIN FIREFIGHTING FOAMS PROHIBITED. Unless otherwise required
 by federal law, a manufacturer of firefighting foams may not
 manufacture, knowingly sell, offer for sale, distribute for sale,
 or distribute for use in this state a firefighting foam designed to
 extinguish flammable liquid fires that contains intentionally
 added perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl chemicals.
 Sec. 501A.0035.  RECALL OF CERTAIN FIREFIGHTING FOAMS. (a)
 Not later than March 1, 2023, a manufacturer of a firefighting foam
 described by Section 501A.003 shall provide to each person who
 sells the firefighting foam in this state written notice of the
 prohibition described by that section.
 (b)  Not later than March 1, 2024, a manufacturer of a
 firefighting foam described by Section 501A.003 shall recall the
 firefighting foam sold or distributed throughout this state and
 provide reimbursement to each retailer or other person subject to
 the recall. In recalling a firefighting foam under this subsection,
 the manufacturer shall:
 (1)  ensure the safe transport and storage of the
 firefighting foam; and
 (2)  maintain documentation on the locations at which
 the manufacturer stores recalled firefighting foam and the total
 amount stored at each location.
 (c)  A manufacturer shall store recalled firefighting foam
 in accordance with Subsection (b)(1), at the cost of the
 manufacturer, for the time as necessary for the department to
 determine a safe method for disposal of the firefighting foam.
 (d)  On request of the attorney general or a district
 attorney, a manufacturer shall provide to the attorney general or
 district attorney the documentation maintained by the manufacturer
 under Subsection (b)(2).
 (e)  This section expires September 1, 2027.
 Sec. 501A.004.  NOTICE REQUIREMENTS FOR SALE OF CERTAIN
 PERSONAL PROTECTIVE EQUIPMENT. (a) A manufacturer or other person
 who sells to a person in this state firefighting personal
 protective equipment that contains perfluoroalkyl and
 polyfluoroalkyl chemicals shall provide to the person, at the time
 of the sale, written notice that:
 (1)  includes a statement warning the equipment
 contains perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl chemicals; and
 (2)  lists the reasons the perfluoroalkyl and
 polyfluoroalkyl chemicals were added to the equipment.
 (b)  A manufacturer or other person who sells firefighting
 personal protective equipment that contains perfluoroalkyl and
 polyfluoroalkyl chemicals shall maintain copies of each written
 notice provided by the manufacturer or person under Subsection (a)
 until at least the third anniversary of the date the equipment was
 sold. The manufacturer or other person shall provide to the
 department on request not later than the 60th day after the date the
 request is received a copy of the written notice and any associated
 sales records.
 Sec. 501A.005.  VERIFICATION OF COMPLIANCE. Not later than
 the 30th day after the date a manufacturer of firefighting foams or
 firefighting personal protective equipment receives a request from
 the department, the manufacturer shall prepare and submit to the
 department, in the form and manner prescribed by the department, a
 written verification of the manufacturer's compliance with this
 chapter.
 Sec. 501A.006.  ASSISTANCE IN PURCHASE OF FIREFIGHTING
 PRODUCTS. The department shall develop and implement a process to
 provide purchasing assistance to governmental entities to ensure
 the entities:
 (1)  avoid purchasing firefighting foam designed to
 extinguish flammable liquid fires that contains intentionally
 added perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl chemicals; and
 (2)  are encouraged to purchase firefighting personal
 protective equipment that does not contain perfluoroalkyl and
 polyfluoroalkyl chemicals.
 Sec. 501A.007.  CIVIL PENALTY. (a) A manufacturer or other
 person who violates this chapter is subject to a civil penalty in an
 amount of:
 (1)  for a first violation, $5,000; and
 (2)  for a second and each subsequent violation,
 $10,000.
 (b)  Each day a violation occurs or continues to occur is a
 separate violation for purposes of assessing a penalty under this
 section.
 (c)  On request of the department, the attorney general may
 bring an action in a district court to collect a civil penalty under
 this section. The attorney general and the department may recover
 reasonable expenses incurred in obtaining relief under this
 section, including court costs, attorney's fees, investigation
 costs, witness fees, and deposition expenses.
 (d)  A civil penalty collected under this section shall be
 deposited to the credit of the clean air account in the general
 revenue fund.
 SECTION 2.  (a) Notwithstanding 501A.002, Health and Safety
 Code, as added by this Act, a person who uses a firefighting foam
 designed to extinguish flammable liquid fires that contains
 intentionally added perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl chemicals
 during or for the training of firefighters is not required to comply
 with that section until January 1, 2022.
 (b)  Notwithstanding Section 501A.003, Health and Safety
 Code, as added by this Act, a manufacturer of a firefighting foam
 designed to extinguish flammable liquid fires that contains
 intentionally added perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl chemicals
 is not required to comply with that section until January 1, 2022.
 (c)  Notwithstanding Section 501A.004, Health and Safety
 Code, as added by this Act, a manufacturer or other person who sells
 firefighting personal protective equipment is not required to
 comply with that section until January 1, 2022.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.