Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2154 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 22, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 25, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 31, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 22, 2021
Analysis May 13, 2021
Analysis March 22, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 31, 2021
Fiscal Note May 5, 2021
Fiscal Note March 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 13, 2021
Bill March 23, 2021