Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2154 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/31/2021

                            S.B. No. 2154


 AN ACT
 relating to the membership of the Public Utility Commission of
 Texas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 12.051(a), Utilities Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  The commission is composed of five [three]
 commissioners appointed by the governor with the advice and consent
 of the senate.
 SECTION 2.  Section 12.053, Utilities Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a) and (b) and adding Subsection (a-1) to
 read as follows:
 (a)  To be eligible for appointment, a commissioner must:
 (1)  be a qualified voter;
 (2)  be a citizen of the United States;
 (3)  be a resident of this state;
 (4)  be a competent and experienced administrator;
 [(4) be well informed and qualified in the field of
 public utilities and utility regulation;] and
 (5)  have at least five years of experience:
 (A)  in the administration of business or
 government; or
 (B)  as a practicing attorney, [or] certified
 public accountant, or professional engineer.
 (a-1)  At least two commissioners must be well informed and
 qualified in the field of public utilities and utility regulation.
 (b)  A person is not eligible for appointment as a
 commissioner if the person:
 (1)  at any time during the one year [two years]
 preceding appointment:
 (A)  personally served as an officer, director,
 owner, employee, partner, or legal representative of a public
 utility regulated by the commission or of an affiliate or direct
 competitor of a public utility regulated by the commission; [or]
 (B)  owned or controlled, directly or indirectly,
 more than a 10 percent interest in a public utility regulated by the
 commission or in an affiliate or direct competitor of a public
 utility regulated by the commission; or
 (C)  served as an executive officer listed under
 Section 1, Article IV, Texas Constitution, other than the secretary
 of state, or a member of the legislature; or
 (2)  is not qualified to serve under Section 12.151,
 12.152, or 12.153.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter B, Chapter 12, Utilities Code, is
 amended by adding Section 12.060 to read as follows:
 Sec. 12.060.  FORMER COMMISSIONER: LOBBYING RESTRICTED. A
 former member of the commission may not, before the first
 anniversary of the date the member ceases to be a member of the
 commission, engage in an activity before the commission that
 requires registration under Chapter 305, Government Code.
 SECTION 4.  (a) Not later than the 30th day after the
 effective date of this Act, the governor shall appoint a person to
 the Public Utility Commission of Texas to serve as the presiding
 officer of the commission in accordance with Section 12.053,
 Utilities Code, as amended by this Act.
 (b)  In making appointments of commissioners to the Public
 Utility Commission of Texas under Section 12.051, Utilities Code,
 as amended by this Act, the governor shall assign staggered terms to
 the commissioners appointed to fill vacancies and to the
 commissioners appointed to new positions to ensure that the
 requirements of Section 30a, Article XVI, Texas Constitution, are
 met.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2154 passed the Senate on
 March 25, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays 0;
 May 25, 2021, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 27, 2021, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 30, 2021, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 30,
 Nays 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2154 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 23, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 145,
 Nays 0, one present not voting; May 27, 2021, House granted request
 of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 30, 2021, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 109, Nays 26, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor