Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2158 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 25, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 28, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 25, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 31, 2021
Analysis May 18, 2021
Analysis April 22, 2021
Analysis April 13, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2021
Bill April 23, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 22, 2021
Fiscal Note April 14, 2021