Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB220 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 30, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 7, 2021
Analysis May 12, 2021
Analysis March 24, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 12, 2021
Bill March 30, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 29, 2021