Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2222 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/28/2021

                    By: Nelson, Huffman S.B. No. 2222
 (In the Senate - Filed April 20, 2021; April 21, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Finance; April 28, 2021,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 12, Nays 0; April 28, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2222 By:  Nelson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain equipment provided for use by the officers of
 the Texas Highway Patrol.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 411, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 411.033 to read as follows:
 Sec. 411.033.  CERTAIN EQUIPMENT FOR VEHICLES. The
 department shall equip all motor vehicles used by officers of the
 Texas Highway Patrol in discharging the officers' official duties
 with bullet-resistant windshields.
 SECTION 2.  The Department of Public Safety is required to
 implement a provision of this Act only if the legislature
 appropriates money specifically for that purpose. If the
 legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that
 purpose, the Department of Public Safety may, but is not required
 to, implement a provision of this Act using other appropriations
 available for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *