Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2222 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 5, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 29, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 23, 2021
Analysis May 13, 2021
Analysis April 26, 2021
Analysis April 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 13, 2021
Bill April 28, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 11, 2021
Fiscal Note April 28, 2021
Fiscal Note April 23, 2021