Senate | 05/19/2021 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/19/2021 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/19/2021 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 05/17/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/14/2021 | Recommendations filed with the Senate | ||
Senate | 05/10/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/10/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/03/2021 | Referred to Local Government | ||
Senate | 05/03/2021 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 04/30/2021 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
Senate | 04/29/2021 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |