Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2240 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 29, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 18, 2021
Fiscal Note May 9, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 12, 2021
Analysis May 7, 2021