Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2243 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill May 4, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 11, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 29, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 22, 2021
Analysis May 18, 2021
Analysis May 4, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2021
Bill May 5, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 13, 2021
Fiscal Note May 5, 2021