Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB231 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 4, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 26, 2021
Analysis April 30, 2021
Analysis March 5, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 1, 2021
Bill March 17, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 26, 2021
Fiscal Note March 8, 2021