Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB239 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 10, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 14, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 28, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 10, 2021
Analysis May 20, 2021
Analysis April 6, 2021
Analysis March 19, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2021
Bill April 8, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 1, 2021
Fiscal Note April 2, 2021
Fiscal Note March 21, 2021