|
06/14/2021
|
Effective on 9/1/21
|
|
|
|
06/14/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/01/2021
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2021
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2021
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2021
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2021
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Record vote RV#1354
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Amended 3-K. Bell and Frank
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Amended 2-Frank
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Amended 1-Frank
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2021
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2021
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2021
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA4 Campbell
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA3 Campbell
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA2 Kolkhorst
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 Kolkhorst
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2021
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Corrected comm. report printed & distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|