Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB25 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 3, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 17, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 10, 2021
Analysis April 30, 2021
Analysis March 11, 2021
Analysis March 8, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 24, 2021
Fiscal Note April 25, 2021
Fiscal Note March 13, 2021
Fiscal Note March 8, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 30, 2021
Bill March 15, 2021