Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB279 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/30/2021

                            S.B. No. 279


 AN ACT
 relating to the inclusion of suicide prevention information on
 certain student identification cards issued by a public school or
 public institution of higher education.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter G, Chapter 38, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 38.353 to read as follows:
 Sec. 38.353.  SUICIDE PREVENTION INFORMATION REQUIRED ON
 CERTAIN STUDENT IDENTIFICATION CARDS. Each student identification
 card issued by a public school to a student in grade six or higher:
 (1)  must have printed on the card the contact
 information for:
 (A)  the National Suicide Prevention Lifeline;
 and
 (B)  the Crisis Text Line; and
 (2)  may have printed on the card the contact
 information for a local suicide prevention hotline, if available.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter Z, Chapter 51, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 51.91941 to read as follows:
 Sec. 51.91941.  SUICIDE PREVENTION INFORMATION REQUIRED ON
 STUDENT IDENTIFICATION CARD. (a) In this section, "institution of
 higher education" has the meaning assigned by Section 61.003.
 (b)  Each student identification card issued by an
 institution of higher education:
 (1)  must have printed on the card the contact
 information for:
 (A)  the National Suicide Prevention Lifeline;
 and
 (B)  the Crisis Text Line; and
 (2)  may have printed on the card the contact
 information for:
 (A)  the campus police department or security for
 the campus at which the student to whom the card is issued regularly
 attends classes or, if the campus does not have a campus police
 department or security, a local nonemergency police contact;
 (B)  the campus health clinic for the campus at
 which the student to whom the card is issued regularly attends
 classes or, if the campus does not have a health clinic, a local
 health clinic; and
 (C)  a local suicide prevention hotline, if
 available.
 SECTION 3.  Sections 38.353 and 51.91941, Education Code, as
 added by this Act, apply only to a student identification card
 issued on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 279 passed the Senate on
 April 29, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 29, 2021, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 279 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 26, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 107,
 Nays 40, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor