Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB282 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 4, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 28, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 4, 2021
Analysis May 10, 2021
Analysis April 16, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 24, 2021
Fiscal Note April 16, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2021
Bill April 20, 2021