Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB282 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/28/2021

                            S.B. No. 282


 AN ACT
 relating to a prohibition against the appropriation of money to
 settle or pay a sexual harassment claim made against certain
 members of the executive, legislative, or judicial branch of state
 government and to a prohibition against the use of other public
 money to settle such a claim.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle B, Title 5, Government Code, is amended
 by adding Chapter 576 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 576.  PROHIBITION ON APPROPRIATION OF MONEY TO SETTLE OR PAY
 SEXUAL HARASSMENT CLAIMS
 Sec. 576.0001.  PROHIBITION ON APPROPRIATION OF MONEY TO
 SETTLE OR PAY SEXUAL HARASSMENT CLAIMS. The legislature may not
 appropriate money and a state agency may not use appropriated money
 to settle or otherwise pay a sexual harassment claim made against a
 person who:
 (1)  is an elected member of the executive,
 legislative, or judicial branch of state government;
 (2)  is appointed by the governor to serve as a member
 of a department, commission, board, or other public office within
 the executive, legislative, or judicial branch of state government;
 or
 (3)  serves as staff for a person described by
 Subdivision (1) or (2).
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 180, Local Government Code, is amended
 by adding Section 180.008 to read as follows:
 Sec. 180.008.  PROHIBITION ON USE OF PUBLIC MONEY TO SETTLE
 OR PAY SEXUAL HARASSMENT CLAIMS. (a) In this section, "political
 subdivision" means a county, municipality, school district, other
 special district, or other subdivision of state government.
 (b)  A political subdivision may not use public money to
 settle or otherwise pay a sexual harassment claim made against a
 person who is:
 (1)  an elected or appointed member of the governing
 body of the political subdivision; or
 (2)  an officer or employee of the political
 subdivision.
 SECTION 3.  Section 12.1058(a), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  An open-enrollment charter school is considered to be:
 (1)  a local government for purposes of Chapter 791,
 Government Code;
 (2)  a local government for purposes of Chapter 2259,
 Government Code, except that an open-enrollment charter school may
 not issue public securities as provided by Section 2259.031(b),
 Government Code;
 (3)  a political subdivision for purposes of Chapter
 172, Local Government Code; [and]
 (4)  a local governmental entity for purposes of
 Subchapter I, Chapter 271, Local Government Code; and
 (5)  a political subdivision for purposes of Section
 180.008, Local Government Code.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 282 passed the Senate on
 April 29, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendments on May 27, 2021, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 282 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 23, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 145,
 Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor