Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB284 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/19/2021

                    S.B. No. 284


 AN ACT
 relating to a study of out-of-state physicians who practiced in
 this state during the COVID-19 pandemic.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  DEFINITION. In this Act, "board" means the Texas
 Medical Board.
 SECTION 2.  STUDY. (a) The board shall conduct a study
 regarding out-of-state physicians who practiced medicine in this
 state during the COVID-19 pandemic pursuant to board rules
 providing for the waiver of licensing requirements during disasters
 and emergencies.
 (b)  In conducting the study, the board shall solicit and
 consider information from hospitals and sponsoring physicians in
 this state, as applicable, regarding the performance of a physician
 described by Subsection (a) of this section.
 SECTION 3.  REPORT. Not later than December 1, 2022, the
 board shall submit to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the
 speaker of the house of representatives, and each standing
 committee of the legislature with primary jurisdiction over the
 board, a written report that includes a summary of the study and any
 legislative recommendations based on the study.
 SECTION 4.  EXPIRATION. This Act expires September 1, 2023.
 SECTION 5.  EFFECTIVE DATE.  This Act takes effect
 immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members
 elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas
 Constitution.  If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
 immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 284 passed the Senate on
 March 25, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 284 passed the House on
 May 18, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 117, Nays 20, two
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor