4 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 7 | | relating to a study of out-of-state physicians who practiced in |
---|
6 | 8 | | this state during the COVID-19 pandemic. |
---|
7 | 9 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 10 | | SECTION 1. DEFINITION. In this Act, "board" means the Texas |
---|
9 | 11 | | Medical Board. |
---|
10 | 12 | | SECTION 2. STUDY. (a) The board shall conduct a study |
---|
11 | 13 | | regarding out-of-state physicians who practiced medicine in this |
---|
12 | 14 | | state during the COVID-19 pandemic pursuant to board rules |
---|
13 | 15 | | providing for the waiver of licensing requirements during disasters |
---|
14 | 16 | | and emergencies. |
---|
15 | 17 | | (b) In conducting the study, the board shall solicit and |
---|
16 | 18 | | consider information from hospitals and sponsoring physicians in |
---|
17 | 19 | | this state, as applicable, regarding the performance of a physician |
---|
18 | 20 | | described by Subsection (a) of this section. |
---|
19 | 21 | | SECTION 3. REPORT. Not later than December 1, 2022, the |
---|
20 | 22 | | board shall submit to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the |
---|
21 | 23 | | speaker of the house of representatives, and each standing |
---|
22 | 24 | | committee of the legislature with primary jurisdiction over the |
---|
23 | 25 | | board, a written report that includes a summary of the study and any |
---|
24 | 26 | | legislative recommendations based on the study. |
---|
25 | 27 | | SECTION 4. EXPIRATION. This Act expires September 1, 2023. |
---|
26 | 28 | | SECTION 5. EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect |
---|
27 | 29 | | immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members |
---|
28 | 30 | | elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas |
---|
29 | 31 | | Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for |
---|
30 | 32 | | immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
31 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
32 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
33 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 284 passed the Senate on |
---|
34 | | - | March 25, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0. |
---|
35 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
36 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
37 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 284 passed the House on |
---|
38 | | - | May 18, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 117, Nays 20, two |
---|
39 | | - | present not voting. |
---|
40 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
41 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
42 | | - | Approved: |
---|
43 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
44 | | - | Date |
---|
45 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
46 | | - | Governor |
---|