Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB284 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 25, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 19, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 25, 2021
Analysis May 10, 2021
Analysis March 15, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2021
Bill March 22, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 26, 2021
Fiscal Note March 16, 2021