Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB284 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 03/15/2021

                    BILL ANALYSIS        Senate Research Center   S.B. 284     87R4676 MAW-D   By: Seliger         Health & Human Services         3/12/2021         As Filed          AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT   During the COVID-19 pandemic, certain Texas licensing requirements for out of state licensed physicians were waived, which allowed qualifying individuals to temporarily practice in Texas.    S.B. 284 requires a one time report to be completed by the Texas Medical Board regarding the basic performance, such as number of disciplinary reviews or actions taken by the board, of out-of-state licensed physicians who practiced during the COVID-19 pandemic under the board's disaster emergency licensure rule.    As proposed, S.B. 284 amends current law relating to a study of out-of-state physicians who practiced in Texas during the COVID-19 pandemic.   RULEMAKING AUTHORITY   This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.   SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS SECTION 1. DEFINITION. Defines "board" to mean the Texas Medical Board (TMB) in this Act.   SECTION 2. STUDY. (a) Requires TMB to conduct a study regarding out-of-state physicians who practiced medicine in Texas during the COVID-19 pandemic pursuant to TMB rules providing for the waiver of licensing requirements during disasters and emergencies.   (b) Requires TMB, in conducting the study, to solicit and consider information from hospitals and sponsoring physicians in Texas, as applicable, regarding the performance of a physician described by Subsection (a) of this section.   SECTION 3. REPORT. Requires TMB, not later than December 1, 2022, to submit to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the Texas House of Representatives, and each standing committee of the legislature with primary jurisdiction over TMB, a written report that includes a summary of the study and any legislative recommendations based on the study.   SECTION 4. EXPIRATION. Provides that this Act expires September 1, 2023.   SECTION 5. Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2021. 

BILL ANALYSIS

 

 

Senate Research Center S.B. 284
87R4676 MAW-D By: Seliger
 Health & Human Services
 3/12/2021
 As Filed

Senate Research Center

S.B. 284

87R4676 MAW-D

By: Seliger

 

Health & Human Services

 

3/12/2021

 

As Filed

 

 

 

AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT

 

During the COVID-19 pandemic, certain Texas licensing requirements for out of state licensed physicians were waived, which allowed qualifying individuals to temporarily practice in Texas. 

 

S.B. 284 requires a one time report to be completed by the Texas Medical Board regarding the basic performance, such as number of disciplinary reviews or actions taken by the board, of out-of-state licensed physicians who practiced during the COVID-19 pandemic under the board's disaster emergency licensure rule. 

 

As proposed, S.B. 284 amends current law relating to a study of out-of-state physicians who practiced in Texas during the COVID-19 pandemic.

 

RULEMAKING AUTHORITY

 

This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.

 

SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS

SECTION 1. DEFINITION. Defines "board" to mean the Texas Medical Board (TMB) in this Act.

 

SECTION 2. STUDY. (a) Requires TMB to conduct a study regarding out-of-state physicians who practiced medicine in Texas during the COVID-19 pandemic pursuant to TMB rules providing for the waiver of licensing requirements during disasters and emergencies.

 

(b) Requires TMB, in conducting the study, to solicit and consider information from hospitals and sponsoring physicians in Texas, as applicable, regarding the performance of a physician described by Subsection (a) of this section.

 

SECTION 3. REPORT. Requires TMB, not later than December 1, 2022, to submit to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the Texas House of Representatives, and each standing committee of the legislature with primary jurisdiction over TMB, a written report that includes a summary of the study and any legislative recommendations based on the study.

 

SECTION 4. EXPIRATION. Provides that this Act expires September 1, 2023.

 

SECTION 5. Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2021.