House
|
05/25/2021
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Postponed 5/25/21 11:30 PM
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA4 Menéndez
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA3 Menéndez
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA2 Eckhardt
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 Perry
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2021
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2021
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Rereferred to committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|