Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB29 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 12, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 15, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2021
Bill March 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 19, 2021
Analysis March 30, 2021
Analysis March 23, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 18, 2021
Fiscal Note March 30, 2021
Fiscal Note March 25, 2021