Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB297 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 7, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 6, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 19, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 25, 2021
Analysis April 28, 2021
Analysis March 12, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 29, 2021
Bill March 26, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 17, 2021