|
06/18/2021
|
Effective on 9/1/21
|
|
|
|
06/18/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/01/2021
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2021
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2021
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2021
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2021
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2021
|
Senate discharges conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2021
|
Record vote
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2021
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2021
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2021
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2021
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2021
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2021
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2021
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2021
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2021
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2021
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2021
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2021
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2021
|
Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2021
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Record vote RV#1506
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 4-Rosenthal
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Record vote RV#1505
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 3-Bucy
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Record vote RV#1504
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 2-C. Turner
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Amended 1-Bonnen
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 18(b), and Rule 4, Section 32(b)(10)
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 Huffman
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2021
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|