Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB321 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 28, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 31, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 24, 2021
Analysis May 18, 2021
Analysis April 20, 2021
Analysis April 14, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 30, 2021
Fiscal Note May 4, 2021
Fiscal Note April 22, 2021
Fiscal Note April 15, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2021
Bill April 22, 2021