Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB331 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 7, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 7, 2021
Analysis May 17, 2021
Analysis March 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2021
Bill March 29, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 16, 2021
Fiscal Note April 25, 2021
Fiscal Note March 25, 2021