Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB331 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/30/2021

                            S.B. No. 331


 AN ACT
 relating to eligibility to serve as an interpreter in an election.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 61.032, Election Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 61.032.  INTERPRETER PERMITTED.  If an election officer
 who attempts to communicate with a voter does not understand the
 language used by the voter, the voter may communicate through an
 interpreter selected by the voter or, if the voter has not selected
 an interpreter, any interpreter an election officer may appoint.
 SECTION 2.  Section 61.033, Election Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 61.033.  ELIGIBILITY TO SERVE AS INTERPRETER. To be
 eligible to serve as an interpreter, a person:
 (1)  may be any person other than the voter's employer,
 an agent of the voter's employer, or an officer or agent of a labor
 union to which the voter belongs; and
 (2)  if appointed to serve as an interpreter by an
 election officer, must be a registered voter of the county in which
 the voter needing the interpreter resides or a registered voter of
 an adjacent county.
 SECTION 3.  Section 61.034, Election Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 61.034.  TRANSLATING BALLOT. If a voter cannot
 comprehend the language in which the ballot is printed, the voter
 may receive assistance in accordance with Subchapter B, Chapter 64
 [an interpreter may accompany the voter to the voting station for
 the purpose of translating the ballot to the voter].
 SECTION 4.  Section 61.035, Election Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 61.035.  OATH. (a) Before serving as an interpreter,
 the person selected as interpreter must take the following oath
 administered by an election officer:
 "I swear (or affirm) that, to the best of my ability, I will
 correctly interpret and translate each question, answer, or
 statement addressed either to the voter by any election officer or
 to an election officer by the voter."
 (b)  A person who will be providing ballot assistance under
 Section 61.034 must also take the oath required by Subchapter B,
 Chapter 64, and meet all other requirements of that subchapter.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 331 passed the Senate on
 April 7, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendment on May 28, 2021, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 331 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 25, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 134,
 Nays 10, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor