Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB337 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 18, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 26, 2021
Analysis May 12, 2021
Analysis April 21, 2021
Analysis April 12, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 12, 2021
Bill April 23, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 22, 2021
Fiscal Note April 18, 2021