House | 05/20/2021 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/20/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/11/2021 | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | Referred to Public Education | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | Read first time | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/14/2021 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/14/2021 | Passed | ||
Senate | 04/14/2021 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 04/14/2021 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 04/14/2021 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/14/2021 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 04/14/2021 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 04/14/2021 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 04/12/2021 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2021 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 03/23/2021 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | Referred to Business & Commerce | ||
Senate | 01/14/2021 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/14/2021 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |