Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB36 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 9, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 8, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 17, 2021
Analysis May 12, 2021
Analysis March 31, 2021
Analysis March 17, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 27, 2021
Fiscal Note April 1, 2021
Fiscal Note March 30, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 12, 2021
Bill April 6, 2021