Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Record vote RV#1398
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Amended 3-Craddick
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Amended 2-Craddick
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Postponed 5/23/21 10:40 AM
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Postponed 5/23/21 10:15 PM
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Amendment withdrawn 1-Craddick
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered 1-Craddick
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2021
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2021
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2021
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Referred to Energy Resources
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2021
|
Corrected comm. report printed & distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2021
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2021
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2021
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2021
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|