Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB367 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 15, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 9, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2021
Bill March 26, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 18, 2021
Analysis March 15, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 13, 2021
Fiscal Note March 15, 2021