Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB374 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 27, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 3, 2021
Analysis April 30, 2021
Analysis March 24, 2021
Analysis March 15, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 12, 2021
Fiscal Note April 22, 2021
Fiscal Note March 24, 2021
Fiscal Note March 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 30, 2021
Bill March 25, 2021