Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB374 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/27/2021

                            S.B. No. 374


 AN ACT
 relating to municipal annexation of certain rights-of-way.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 43.1055, Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 43.1055.  ANNEXATION OF ROAD [ROADS AND] RIGHTS-OF-WAY
 ON REQUEST OF OWNER OR MAINTAINING POLITICAL SUBDIVISION.
 Notwithstanding any other law, a municipality may by ordinance
 annex a road [or the] right-of-way [of a road] on request of the
 owner of the [road or] right-of-way or the governing body of the
 political subdivision that maintains the [road or] right-of-way
 under the procedures prescribed by Subchapter C-1.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter E, Chapter 43, Local Government Code,
 is amended by adding Section 43.1056 to read as follows:
 Sec. 43.1056.  ANNEXATION OF CONTIGUOUS OR CONNECTING
 RIGHTS-OF-WAY. (a) Notwithstanding any other law, a municipality
 that is annexing an area under Subchapter C-3, C-4, C-5, or D may
 also annex with the area the right-of-way of a street, highway,
 alley, or other public way or of a railway line, spur, or roadbed,
 that is:
 (1)  contiguous and runs parallel to the municipality's
 boundaries; and
 (2)  contiguous to the area being annexed under
 Subchapter C-3, C-4, C-5, or D.
 (b)  A municipality may annex a right-of-way under this
 section only if:
 (1)  the municipality provides written notice of the
 annexation to the owner of the right-of-way, through the owner's
 registered agent, if applicable, not later than the 61st day before
 the date of the proposed annexation; and
 (2)  the owner of the right-of-way does not submit a
 written objection to the municipality before the date of the
 proposed annexation.
 (c)  If the owner of a right-of-way proposed to be annexed
 under this section is a governmental entity, the entity may specify
 the location at which a municipality must deliver notice under
 Subsection (b).
 (d)  Section 43.054 does not apply to the annexation of a
 right-of-way under this section.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 374 passed the Senate on
 April 9, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 27, 2021, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 374 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 11, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 121,
 Nays 21, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor