Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB383 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 22, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 29, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 31, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 24, 2021
Analysis May 7, 2021
Analysis March 15, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 31, 2021
Fiscal Note May 1, 2021
Fiscal Note March 13, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 7, 2021
Bill March 22, 2021