Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB383 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-S.B. No. 383
1+By: Powell, et al. S.B. No. 383
2+ (Perez, Fierro)
23
34
5+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
46 AN ACT
57 relating to disclosure requirements of certain facilities that
68 provide care for persons with Alzheimer's disease and related
79 disorders.
810 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
911 SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 242, Health and Safety
1012 Code, is amended by adding Section 242.0405 to read as follows:
1113 Sec. 242.0405. NOTICE OF ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE AND RELATED
12- DISORDERS CERTIFICATION. (a) A nursing facility advertising,
13- marketing, or otherwise promoting that the facility provides memory
14- care services shall prepare a written notice disclosing whether the
15- facility is certified or is not certified under Section 242.040 to
16- provide specialized care and treatment for facility residents with
17- Alzheimer's disease and related disorders.
14+ DISORDERS CERTIFICATION. (a) A nursing facility shall prepare a
15+ written notice disclosing whether the facility is certified or is
16+ not certified under Section 242.040 to provide specialized care and
17+ treatment for facility residents with Alzheimer's disease and
18+ related disorders.
1819 (b) The nursing facility shall provide the notice described
1920 by Subsection (a) to:
2021 (1) each facility resident; and
2122 (2) each person applying for services from the
2223 facility or the person's next of kin or guardian.
23- (c) A nursing facility that provides the notice required
24- under Subsection (a) is not required to include the information
25- described by Section 242.202(d)(2) in a disclosure statement
26- provided under that section.
27- SECTION 2. Subchapter B, Chapter 247, Health and Safety
24+ SECTION 2. Section 242.202(d), Health and Safety Code, is
25+ amended to read as follows:
26+ (d) The disclosure statement must contain the following
27+ categories of information:
28+ (1) the institution's philosophy of care;
29+ (2) [whether the institution is certified under
30+ Section 242.040 for the provision of specialized care and treatment
31+ of residents with Alzheimer's disease and related disorders;
32+ [(3)] the preadmission, admission, and discharge
33+ process;
34+ (3) [(4)] resident assessment, care planning, and
35+ implementation of the care plan;
36+ (4) [(5)] staffing patterns, such as
37+ resident-to-staff ratios, and staff training;
38+ (5) [(6)] the physical environment of the
39+ institution;
40+ (6) [(7)] resident activities;
41+ (7) [(8)] program costs;
42+ (8) [(9)] systems for evaluation of the institution's
43+ programs for residents;
44+ (9) [(10)] family involvement in resident care; and
45+ (10) [(11)] the toll-free telephone number maintained
46+ by the department for acceptance of complaints against the
47+ institution.
48+ SECTION 3. Subchapter B, Chapter 247, Health and Safety
2849 Code, is amended by adding Section 247.0295 to read as follows:
2950 Sec. 247.0295. NOTICE OF ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE OR RELATED
30- DISORDERS LICENSE CLASSIFICATION. (a) An assisted living facility
31- advertising, marketing, or otherwise promoting that the facility
32- provides memory care services shall provide to each facility
33- resident written notice disclosing whether the facility holds a
34- license or does not hold a license classified under Section 247.029
35- to provide personal care services to residents with Alzheimer's
36- disease or related disorders.
37- (b) An assisted living facility that provides the notice
38- required under Subsection (a) is not required under Section
39- 247.026(c-1) to include in the facility's consumer disclosure
40- statement information on whether the facility holds a license
51+ DISORDERS LICENSE CLASSIFICATION. An assisted living facility
52+ shall provide to each facility resident written notice disclosing
53+ whether the facility holds a license or does not hold a license
4154 classified under Section 247.029 to provide personal care services
4255 to residents with Alzheimer's disease or related disorders.
43- SECTION 3. As soon as practicable after the effective date
56+ SECTION 4. Section 247.026(c-1), Health and Safety Code, is
57+ repealed.
58+ SECTION 5. As soon as practicable after the effective date
4459 of this Act, the executive commissioner of the Health and Human
45- Services Commission shall adopt rules to implement Sections
46- 242.0405 and 247.0295, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act.
47- SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
48- ______________________________ ______________________________
49- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
50- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 383 passed the Senate on
51- March 29, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1;
52- May 25, 2021, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
53- requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 27, 2021, House
54- granted request of the Senate; May 29, 2021, Senate adopted
55- Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 30,
56- Nays 1.
57- ______________________________
58- Secretary of the Senate
59- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 383 passed the House, with
60- amendments, on May 18, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 100,
61- Nays 44, one present not voting; May 27, 2021, House granted
62- request of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
63- May 30, 2021, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
64- following vote: Yeas 111, Nays 32, one present not voting.
65- ______________________________
66- Chief Clerk of the House
67- Approved:
68- ______________________________
69- Date
70- ______________________________
71- Governor
60+ Services Commission shall adopt rules to implement the changes in
61+ law made by this Act.
62+ SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.