Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB385 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/27/2021

                            By: Powell S.B. No. 385
 (In the Senate - Filed January 21, 2021; March 9, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Local Government;
 April 27, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 0; April 27, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of the Tarrant County Hospital District
 or a nonprofit corporation formed by the district regarding certain
 technology or intellectual property owned by or licensed to the
 district or corporation.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 281, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 281.0519 to read as follows:
 Sec. 281.0519.  TARRANT COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT; AUTHORITY
 TO SELL OR LICENSE INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY. (a) The Tarrant County
 Hospital District or a nonprofit corporation formed by the district
 may:
 (1)  sell or license technology or intellectual
 property that is owned by or licensed to the district or a nonprofit
 corporation formed by the district;
 (2)  enter into a contract to provide services related
 to technology or intellectual property sold or licensed under
 Subdivision (1);
 (3)  contract, collaborate, or enter into a joint
 venture or other agreement with a public or private entity to engage
 in an activity authorized under Subdivision (1) or (2); or
 (4)  take any other action necessary to protect or
 benefit from the exclusivity of technology and intellectual
 property owned by or licensed to the district or a nonprofit
 corporation formed by the district, including applying for,
 acquiring, registering, securing, holding, protecting, and
 renewing under applicable provisions of state, federal, or
 international law:
 (A)  a patent;
 (B)  a copyright;
 (C)  a trademark, service mark, collective mark,
 or certification mark; or
 (D)  any other form of protection of intellectual
 property provided by law.
 (b)  For purposes of Subsection (a)(3):
 (1)  a public or private entity may be a for-profit or a
 nonprofit entity; and
 (2)  a nonprofit corporation formed by the district may
 hold an ownership interest in a public or private entity described
 by Subsection (a)(3).
 (c)  Information prepared or compiled by or for the Tarrant
 County Hospital District or a nonprofit corporation formed by the
 district relating to the development of technology or intellectual
 property to which this section applies is exempt from public
 disclosure under Chapter 552, Government Code.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *