Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB387 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 22, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 27, 2021
Analysis May 14, 2021
Analysis March 29, 2021
Analysis March 25, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2021
Bill March 30, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 7, 2021
Fiscal Note March 29, 2021
Fiscal Note March 27, 2021