4 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 7 | | relating to the appeal of rates for water or sewer service charged |
---|
6 | 8 | | to certain customers of a municipality. |
---|
7 | 9 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 10 | | SECTION 1. Section 13.043, Water Code, is amended by |
---|
9 | 11 | | amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (b-4) to read as |
---|
10 | 12 | | follows: |
---|
11 | 13 | | (b) Ratepayers of the following entities may appeal the |
---|
12 | 14 | | decision of the governing body of the entity affecting their water, |
---|
13 | 15 | | drainage, or sewer rates to the utility commission: |
---|
14 | 16 | | (1) a nonprofit water supply or sewer service |
---|
15 | 17 | | corporation created and operating under Chapter 67; |
---|
16 | 18 | | (2) a utility under the jurisdiction of a municipality |
---|
17 | 19 | | inside the corporate limits of the municipality; |
---|
18 | 20 | | (3) a municipally owned utility, if the ratepayers |
---|
19 | 21 | | reside outside the corporate limits of the municipality, including |
---|
20 | 22 | | a decision of a governing body that results in an increase in rates |
---|
21 | 23 | | when the municipally owned utility takes over the provision of |
---|
22 | 24 | | service to ratepayers previously served by another retail public |
---|
23 | 25 | | utility; |
---|
24 | 26 | | (4) a district or authority created under Article III, |
---|
25 | 27 | | Section 52, or Article XVI, Section 59, of the Texas Constitution |
---|
26 | 28 | | that provides water or sewer service to household users; and |
---|
27 | 29 | | (5) a utility owned by an affected county, if the |
---|
28 | 30 | | ratepayer's rates are actually or may be adversely affected. For |
---|
29 | 31 | | the purposes of this section ratepayers who reside outside the |
---|
30 | 32 | | boundaries of the district or authority shall be considered a |
---|
31 | 33 | | separate class from ratepayers who reside inside those boundaries. |
---|
32 | 34 | | (b-4) Subsection (b)(3) does not apply to a municipally |
---|
33 | 35 | | owned utility that takes over the provision of service to |
---|
34 | 36 | | ratepayers previously served by another retail public utility if |
---|
35 | 37 | | the municipally owned utility: |
---|
36 | 38 | | (1) takes over the service at the request of the |
---|
37 | 39 | | ratepayer; |
---|
38 | 40 | | (2) takes over the service in the manner provided by |
---|
39 | 41 | | Subchapter H; or |
---|
40 | 42 | | (3) is required to take over the service by state law, |
---|
41 | 43 | | an order of the commission, or an order of the utility commission. |
---|
42 | 44 | | SECTION 2. (a) Notwithstanding Section 13.043(c), Water |
---|
43 | 45 | | Code, a ratepayer described by Section 13.043(b), Water Code, as |
---|
44 | 46 | | amended by this Act, may use the appeal process in Section 13.043, |
---|
45 | 47 | | Water Code, to appeal increased rates charged to the ratepayer by a |
---|
46 | 48 | | municipally owned utility by filing a petition for review with the |
---|
47 | 49 | | Public Utility Commission of Texas and the municipally owned |
---|
48 | 50 | | utility not later than December 1, 2021, if the municipally owned |
---|
49 | 51 | | utility began providing service to the ratepayer on or after |
---|
50 | 52 | | September 1, 2016. |
---|
51 | 53 | | (b) Subsection (a) of this section applies only to rates |
---|
52 | 54 | | that the municipally owned utility has not changed since the |
---|
53 | 55 | | municipally owned utility began providing service to the ratepayer. |
---|
54 | 56 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
55 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
56 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
57 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 387 passed the Senate on |
---|
58 | | - | April 9, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
59 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
60 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
61 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 387 passed the House on |
---|
62 | | - | May 23, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 2, two present |
---|
63 | | - | not voting. |
---|
64 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
65 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
66 | | - | Approved: |
---|
67 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
68 | | - | Date |
---|
69 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
70 | | - | Governor |
---|