Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB397 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/21/2021

                            By: Menéndez S.B. No. 397
 (In the Senate - Filed January 22, 2021; March 9, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Veteran Affairs & Border
 Security; April 21, 2021, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; April 21, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the issuance of specialty license plates for recipients
 of the Borinqueneers Congressional Gold Medal.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 504.315, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (r) to read as follows:
 (r)  The department shall issue specialty license plates for
 recipients of the Borinqueneers Congressional Gold Medal.  License
 plates issued under this subsection must include the Borinqueneers
 Congressional Gold Medal emblem and must include the words
 "Borinqueneers Congressional Gold Medal" at the bottom of each
 plate.  License plates issued under this subsection that are not
 personalized must also include the letter "B" as a prefix or suffix
 to the numerals on each plate.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *