Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB452 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 26, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 31, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 17, 2021
Analysis May 22, 2021
Analysis April 19, 2021
Analysis April 12, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2021
Bill April 20, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 21, 2021
Fiscal Note April 19, 2021
Fiscal Note April 11, 2021