Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB460 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 26, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 8, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 18, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 25, 2021
Analysis May 5, 2021
Analysis March 22, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 5, 2021
Bill April 1, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 30, 2021
Fiscal Note March 29, 2021