Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB462 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/31/2021

                            S.B. No. 462


 AN ACT
 relating to funding under the transportation allotment for
 transporting meals and instructional materials to students during a
 declared disaster.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 48.151, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (h) and adding Subsection (n) to read as
 follows:
 (h)  Funds allotted under this section must be used in
 providing transportation services. Transporting a meal or
 instructional materials as provided by Subsection (n) is included
 in transportation services under this subsection.
 (n)  For the duration of a declared disaster, a school
 district located in an area that is wholly or partly the subject of
 a disaster declaration by the governor under Chapter 418,
 Government Code, or by the president of the United States may be
 reimbursed on a per-mile basis for the cost of transporting a meal
 or instructional materials to a student's residence or to another
 location, designated by the district, for pick up by the student.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 462 passed the Senate on
 April 21, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 29, 2021, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 462 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 26, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 117,
 Nays 30, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor